CA SR72 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4058.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 45th anniversary of the Roe v. Wade decision

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the 45th anniversary of the Roe v. Wade decision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR72 Leyva et al (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4058.)
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4043.) (January 16).
2018-01-11SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback