CA SR71 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4933.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4933.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Service Dog Appreciation Month.
Title
Relative to Service Dog Appreciation Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent SR71 Seyarto et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4933.) |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Seyarto. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Seyarto. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |