CA SR66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to reproductive health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to reproductive health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR66 Leyva et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.)
2020-01-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3088.) (January 14).
2020-01-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 14).
2020-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2020-01-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-01-06SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback