CA SR63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to women’s reproductive health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to women’s reproductive health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-12SenateFrom committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (January 12).
2022-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 12.
2022-01-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2022-01-03SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback