CA SR61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - January 14 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - January 14 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to gun violence.
Title
Relative to gun violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | January 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SR61 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SR61 |