CA SR51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2127.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2127.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a New Five-year National Offshore Oil and Gas Leasing Program on the Outer Continental Shelf
Title
Relative to a New Five-year National Offshore Oil and Gas Leasing Program on the Outer Continental Shelf
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR51 McGuire et al (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2127.) |
2017-07-19 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |