CA SR50 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1810.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR50 McGuire et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1810.)
2019-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-06-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback