CA SR45 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3304.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3304.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to academic freedom.
Title
Relative to academic freedom.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR45 Min (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3304.) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (March 29). |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |