CA SR44 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4623.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Probation Services Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Probation Services Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR44 Caballero (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-20SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4623.)
2024-06-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-10SenateOrdered to second reading.
2024-06-10SenateRead third time and amended.
2024-06-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-06SenateOrdered to second reading.
2024-06-06SenateFrom inactive file on motion of Senator Caballero.
2023-09-07SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Caballero.
2023-06-28SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2023-06-15SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback