CA SR32 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on the inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Physical Fitness and Sports Month.
Title
Relative to National Physical Fitness and Sports Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on the inactive file. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Morrell. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sr_32&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sr_32_bill_20150521_introduced.html |