CA SR19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 401.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 401.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Greek Independence Day.
Title
Relative to Greek Independence Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR19 Borgeas et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 401.) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |