CA SR12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 86.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 86.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to women’s reproductive health
Title
Relative to women’s reproductive health
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR12 Atkins (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR12 Atkins Reconsider (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR12 Atkins (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR12 Atkins Reconsider (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR12 Atkins (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 86.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 85.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Atkins. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 7. Page 84.) |
2017-01-13 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 70.) (January 13). |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |