CA SR113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 40th anniversary of Proposition 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the 40th anniversary of Proposition 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Senate - [08-15-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15SenateReconsideration granted.
2018-08-15SenateAugust 15 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 5325.)
2018-08-10SenateSet for hearing August 15.
2018-08-08SenateAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-02SenateSet for hearing August 8.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-13SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback