CA SR10 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Áo DÃ i Day
Title
Relative to Áo DÃ i Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR10 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |