CA SJR9 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-2-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-2-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the nonresident tuition exemption and undocumented students.
Title
20th anniversary of the nonresident tuition exemption: American Families Plan: immigration reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR9 Limón et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SJR 9 Limón Senate Third Reading By Medina (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR9 Limón (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR9 Limón (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR9 Limón (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SJR 9 Limón Senate Third Reading By Medina (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR9 Limón (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR9 Limón (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR9 Limón (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4897.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 5751.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Flora. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3230.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3230.) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Limón. |
2022-03-28 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 3229.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2022-03-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3061.) (March 9). |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 9. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |