CA SJR8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to special education funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special education funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-15 - Assembly - SJR 8 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SJR8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-23SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-08-15SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2729.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-06-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-06-17SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1606.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-06-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1437.) (June 5).
2019-05-08SenateSet for hearing June 5.
2019-04-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-10SenateApril 24 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback