CA SJR6 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Affordable Housing Credit Improvement Act.
Title
Affordable Housing Credit Improvement Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SJR 6 Wiener Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar SJR6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar SJR6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2021-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2525.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 24). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1992.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1880.) (July 8). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Set for hearing July 8. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |