CA SJR4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Title X.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title X.

Sponsors

Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Sen. Jerry Hill [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Sen. Susan Rubio [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Assembly - SJR 4 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR4 Leyva et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-15SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-02SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-07-01AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 2488.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 11).
2019-04-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-03-28SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 476.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 385.) (March 20).
2019-03-15SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2019-03-14SenateMarch 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-14SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback