CA SJR30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-12)
Status: Passed on September 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Amtrak National Network.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amtrak National Network.

Sponsors

Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Jim Beall [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - SJR 30 McGuire Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR30 McGuire et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6793.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-27AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Obernolte.
2018-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2018-08-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-23AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6468.)
2018-08-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-20SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5465.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-15SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-09SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback