CA SJR3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Social Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Security.

Sponsors

Sen. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Assembly - SJR 3 Wilk Senate Third Reading By O'Donnell (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR3 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-19SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
2019-08-13SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-12AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2019-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-06SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24).
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback