CA SJR28 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to immigrant children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigrant children: legal representation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-31 - Assembly - SJR 28 Lara Senate Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR28 Lara (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-09SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-09SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2016-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-31AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 58. Noes 8. Page 6547.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2016-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2016-08-25SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-08-25SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-23SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback