CA SJR26 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Mare Island Naval Cemetery.
Title
Mare Island Naval Cemetery.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - SJR 26 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR26 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR26 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4226.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |