CA SJR22 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Calexico West Land Port of Entry project.
Title
Calexico West Land Port of Entry project: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Special Consent SJR22 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SJR 22 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR22 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SJR 22 Hueso Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR22 Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4882.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5708.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3712.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3689.) (April 26). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |