CA SJR20 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electricity.
Title
Electrical grid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - SJR 20 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR20 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR20 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6148.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4937.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |