CA SJR20 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to gun violence.
Title
Gun violence: research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - SJR 20 Hall Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR20 Hall (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR20 Hall (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 5572.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 3428.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3396.) (April 5). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |