CA SJR2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration reform.
Title
Immigration reform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SJR 2 Hueso Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Hueso et al (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Hueso et al (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 2562.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 8). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 750.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 6). |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |