CA SJR2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the President’s National Emergency Declaration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The President’s National Emergency Declaration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Assembly - SJR 2 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Eggman (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Umberg et al (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2019.
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-05-14SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-05-13AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 1637.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 7).
2019-04-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-04-04SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 561.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26).
2019-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-22SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2019-03-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback