CA SJR19 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special education funding.
Title
Special education funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR19 Wilk et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - SJR 19 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR19 Wilk et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - SJR 19 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR19 Wilk et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5025.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4446.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Wilk. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wilk. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |