CA SJR16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to federal Temporary Protected Status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Temporary Protected Status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR16 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5007.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-04-09SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4515.) (April 3).
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback