CA SJR15 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-18-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Port Chicago 50.
Title
Port Chicago 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR15 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - SJR 15 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SJR15 Glazer (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - SJR 15 Glazer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SJR15 Glazer (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4654.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3645.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3516.) (April 26). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |