CA SJR11 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - March 18 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - March 18 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Spent Fuel Prioritization Act of 2019.
Title
Spent Fuel Prioritization Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Asm. Tasha Boerner Horvath [D] | Asm. William Brough [R] |
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | March 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | March 4 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2329.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2313.) (August 28). |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Set for hearing August 28. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |