CA SJR1 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to student loan debt.
Title
Student loan debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR1 Allen Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SJR 1 Allen Senate Third Reading By Lee (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR1 Allen (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Assembly - SJR 1 Allen Senate Third Reading By Lee (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR1 Allen (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2516.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 55. Noes 13. Page 2564.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 913.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 604.) (March 24). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |