CA SJR1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - June 20 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - June 20 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration.
Title
Immigration.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | June 20 hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Set for hearing June 20. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SJR1 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SJR1 |