CA SCR91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Law Revision Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Law Revision Commission: studies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - SCR 91 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR91 Roth et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-13SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-13AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4213.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-02-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-23SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback