CA SCR82 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of the Joint Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 2021–22 Regular Session.
Title
Joint Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR82 Atkins Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - SCR 82 Atkins Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - WORF SCR82 Atkins (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - SCR 82 Atkins Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - WORF SCR82 Atkins (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-03-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3138.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 3813.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 13. Page 3811.) |
2022-03-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 3036.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | (Corrected March 7.) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Held at desk. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced. |