CA SCR67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Jack Williams Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Jack Williams Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2020-01-15SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3088.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-08SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2019-08-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-08-13SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback