CA SCR62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Wildlife Crossing at Liberty Canyon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife Crossing at Liberty Canyon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR62 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-08-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-08-15SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2182.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-07-12SenateSet for hearing August 12.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 2096.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-27SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback