CA SCR56 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - Assembly - SCR 56 Niello Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Special Consent SCR56 Niello (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2024.
2024-02-27 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2024-02-22SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-02-22AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4171.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-02-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 20).
2023-09-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2023-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2023-09-01SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2023-05-10SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2023-04-27SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback