CA SCR56 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Annette Brooks Memorial Bridge.
Title
Annette Brooks Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Assembly - SCR 56 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR56 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR56 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3619.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2053.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Set for hearing July 8. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1776.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Set for hearing June 25. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |