CA SCR55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Cancer Survivors Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Cancer Survivors Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - SCR 55 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR55 Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-20SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m.
2019-06-13SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-13AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-06-03SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1400.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-29SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-24SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback