CA SCR53 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-7-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-7-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to climate change.
Title
Climate change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR53 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR53 McGuire et al (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR53 McGuire et al (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4713.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5752.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 2821.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2740.) (January 10). |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 10. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |