CA SCR52 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-22-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Parks and Recreation Professionals Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Parks and Recreation Professionals Month.

Sponsors

Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Sen. Andreas Borgeas [R]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. John Laird [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Sen. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]

Roll Calls

2021-08-19 - Assembly - SCR 52 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR52 McGuire et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 126, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-08-23SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-19AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2440.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-07-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15).
2021-07-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-07-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-07-12SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1904.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback