CA SCR52 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Motorcycle Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycle Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Assembly - SCR 52 Jones Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR52 Jones (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2019.
2019-06-14SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-06-06SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-06AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2221.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 30).
2019-05-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-24SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1305.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback