CA SCR51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Music Changing Lives Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Music Changing Lives Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR51 Morrell et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SCR 51 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR51 Morrell et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
2019-09-06SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-06SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-05SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3049.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-08-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-28SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1333.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-22SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback