CA SCR47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Small Business Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Small Business Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - SCR 47 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR47 Rubio et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-09SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-06-27SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-27AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2460.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2019-06-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-16SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-07SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback