CA SCR44 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Privacy Awareness Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy Awareness Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-12 - Assembly - SCR 44 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR44 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-19SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-19SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
2019-08-12SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-12AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-13SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1032.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-01SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback