CA SCR43 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.
Title
California Holocaust Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Assembly - SCR 43 Wiener Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR43 Wiener et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR43 Wiener et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-05-18 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2023-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1528.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 717.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |