CA SCR37 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Latino Veterans Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Latino Veterans Day.

Sponsors

Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Assembly - SCR 37 Archuleta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR37 Archuleta et al (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-08-30SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-26AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2523.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-08-19AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19).
2021-07-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-07-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-07-12SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead third time and amended.
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback