CA SCR36 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-05 - Assembly - SCR 36 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR36 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-15SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-07-05AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2549.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-06SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 957.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback