CA SCR3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to President George H.W. Bush Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

President George H.W. Bush Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR3 Bates et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-01-18SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-01-16SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-01-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-03SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback